EP0807282 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | For all designated states Casio Electronics Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 229, Sakuragaoka 2-chome Higashiyamato-shi Tokyo 207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | ||
For all designated states Casio Electronics Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 229, Sakuragaoka 2-chome Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | |||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
For all designated states Casio Electronics Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 229, Sakuragaoka 2-chome Higashiyamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMANARI, Tatsumi 456-1-105, Kumagawa Fussa-shi, Tokyo 197 / JP | 02 /
YORIFUJI, Takao 1-1425-3-420, Sakuragaoka Higashi-Yamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | 03 /
ONO, Noriki 3-346-8, Takagi Higashi-Yamato-shi, Tokyo 207 / JP | 04 /
KOROKU, Moriyuki 2-15-11-105, Kumegawa-cho Higashi-Murayama-shi, Tokyo 189 / JP | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939319.8 | 28.11.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996JP03480 | Priority number, date | JP19950314398 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: JP 31439895 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721152 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807282 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01, G03G21/16 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
G03G21/1666 (EP,US);
G03G15/0194 (EP,US);
G03G21/1628 (EP,US);
H04N1/506 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0103 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1603 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1687 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSGERÄT | [1997/47] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [1997/47] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION D'IMAGES | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05107849 ; | [A]JPS62165669 ; | [A]US5177554 (ODA GORO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 56 - line 60; figure 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930824), vol. 017, no. 464, Database accession no. (P - 1599), & JP05107849 A 19930430 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880109), vol. 012, no. 006, Database accession no. (P - 653), & JP62165669 A 19870722 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |