EP1023301 - A HETEROCYCLIC CHEMICAL COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioneris AB Ekonomikonsult Grenstigen 2A 181 31 Lidingö / SE | [2003/12] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states PERSTORP AB 284 80 Perstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Lars Möllegängen 17 S-281 37 Hässleholm / SE | 02 /
REHNBERG, Nicola Klövergatan 28 S-284 38 Perstorp / SE | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939392.5 | 23.10.1996 | [2000/31] | WO1996SE01352 | Priority number, date | SE19950004008 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: SE 9504008 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718220 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023301 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023301 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/59 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
C07F9/59 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07F9/572 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | EINE HETEROZYKLISCHE CHEMISCHE VERBINDUNG | [2000/31] | English: | A HETEROCYCLIC CHEMICAL COMPOUND | [2000/31] | French: | COMPOSE CHIMIQUE HETEROCYCLIQUE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.05.1998 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2000 | 31.10.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2003 | BE | 09.04.2003 | FI | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | DK | 09.07.2003 | GR | 09.07.2003 | PT | 09.07.2003 | IE | 23.10.2003 | LU | 23.10.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.10.2003 | ||
LU | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
LU | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
LU | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
PT | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [P] - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 125, No. 5, 29 July 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, US), MALMBERG MATS et al., "A Facile Synthesis of N-substituted D-arabino-piperidinol Phosphates from the Inositol Phosphate .alpha.-trinositol", Abstract No. 58918; & SYNLETT., (1996), (4), 361-362. |