EP0852835 - SUPERSONIC AND SUBSONIC LASER WITH RF DISCHARGE EXCITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krasnov, Alexander 117 W. Maple Street Bryan, OH 43506 / US | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 860245 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939440.2 | 26.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996US15400 | Priority number, date | US19950534796 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: US 534796 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712430 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852835 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852835 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/0975 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H01S3/0975 (EP,US);
H01S3/0979 (EP,US);
Y10S372/701 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/29] | H01S3/097 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | ÜBERSCHALL- UND UNTERSCHALLLASER MIT RF-ENTLADUNGSANREGUNG | [2004/07] | English: | SUPERSONIC AND SUBSONIC LASER WITH RF DISCHARGE EXCITATION | [1998/29] | French: | LASER SUPERSONIQUE ET SUBSONIQUE EXCITE PAR DECHARGE RF | [2004/07] |
Former [1998/29] | ÜBERSCHALL- UND UNTERSCHALLLASER MIT HF-ENTLADUNGSANREGUNG | ||
Former [1998/29] | LASER SUPERSONIQUE ET SUBSONIQUE EXCITE PAR DECHARGE HF | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4686681 (PARANTO JOSEPH N [US], et al); | [Y]US5067135 (PERZL PETER R [DE], et al); | [Y]US5153892 (KAWAKUBO YUKIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5206876 (VON BUELOW HARTWIG [DE], et al); | [Y]US3681710 (LARY EDMUND C, et al); | [Y]US4841537 (ALEXANDROV ANDREI J [SU], et al) | Examination | US4686681 | - V. A. Lisovskiy, "Alpha-Gamma Transition Properties of an RF Discharge in Argon", Plasma Science, 1997, IEEE Conference Record - Abstracts; 1997 IEEE International Conference of San Diego, CA, USA; 19-22 May 1997; New-York, NY, USA; IEEE, US. |