EP0861499 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A FIELD EMITTER CATHODE USING A PARTICULATE FIELD EMITTER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCHET-FINCHER, Graciela, Beatriz 2005 Fairwood Lane Wilmington, DE 19810-3618 / US | 02 /
HOLSTEIN, William, Leo 1122 Elderon Drive Wilmington, DE 19808-1923 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMONEY, Shekhar 425 Stella Drive Hockessin, DE 19707-1922 / US | 04 /
HERRON, Norman 408 Apple Road Newark, DE 19711-5118 / US | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96939680.3 | 13.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996US18145 | Priority number, date | US19950006747P | 15.11.1995 Original published format: US 6747 P | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718577 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861499 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861499 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/02 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
H01J9/025 (EP,US);
H01J1/304 (KR);
C01B32/05 (KR);
H01J9/02 (KR);
H01J2201/30457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FELDEMISSIONSKATHODE MITTELS EINES TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN FELDEMISSIONSMATERIAL | [1998/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING A FIELD EMITTER CATHODE USING A PARTICULATE FIELD EMITTER MATERIAL | [1998/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CATHODE D'EMISSION DE CHAMP AU MOYEN D'UN MATERIAU EMETTEUR DE CHAMP PARTICULAIRE | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.10.1999 | IT | 27.10.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 27.10.1999 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0712146 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [PX] 13,14 * claims 5-10 *; | [PX]WO9600974 (SILICON VIDEO CORP [US], et al) [PX] 13,14 * claims 19-46 *; | [XA]WO9105361 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 13,14 * claims 1-10 * * claim 1 * [A] 1; | [A]US5129850 (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5199918 (KUMAR NALIN [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |