EP0871521 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE GAME OF TENNIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belstar Services B.V. 4th floor, Aert Van Nesstraat 45 3012 CA Rotterdam / NL | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASH, Patrick, Hart Patrick Cash & Associates 10 Nicholson Street Footscray, VIC 3011 / AU | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939754.6 | 29.11.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996AU00772 | Priority number, date | AU1995PN06913 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: AU PN691395 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719731 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871521 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63B61/00, A63B69/38 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
A63B61/006 (EP);
A63B47/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH DES TENNISSPIELS | [1998/43] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THE GAME OF TENNIS | [1998/43] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AU JEU DE TENNIS | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 22.05.1998 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 02.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2001 | 30.11.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2615715 (BALLARD MOORE JAMES) [A] 1-3,7 * column W *; | [A]US3989246 (BROWN ALVIN I, et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US4938479 (JENKINS CRAIG D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column W * [A] 4,5; | [A]US5072947 (BLUE JOHN D [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 48 - line 65; figure 1 * | International search | [X]AU2817877 (FERREIRA GODINHO M); | [X]US4886268 (LANGSLET ERIC B [US]); | [X]US4919421 (VANDEVELD PAUL A [US]); | [A]US4971319 (CUTRONE JOHN [US]) |