EP0864197 - METHOD OF DETERMINING THE INITIAL ROTOR POSITION OF A SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sieb & Meyer Aktiengesellschaft Auf dem Schmaarkamp 21 21339 Lüneburg / DE | [2002/22] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Sieb & Meyer Elektronik GmbH Auf dem Schaarkamp 21 21339 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Johannes Wilhelm-Hänel-Weg 16 D-21339 Lüneburg / DE | 02 /
SCHRÖTER, Gerhard Am Plaggenschlag 6 D-21339 Lüneburg / DE | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Vonnemann, Gerhard VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Vonnemann, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing. Dr. Vonnemann & Partner, An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939873.4 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/38] | WO1996EP05130 | Priority number, date | DE1995144183 | 27.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19544183 | DE1996104701 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19604701 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720382 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0864197 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864197 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/20, H02P1/16 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
H02P6/22 (EP);
H02P1/163 (EP);
H02P1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/27] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ANFANGS-ROTORLAGE EINES SYNCHRONMOTORS | [1998/38] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING THE INITIAL ROTOR POSITION OF A SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR | [1998/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA POSITION INITIALE DU ROTOR D'UN MOTEUR SYNCHRONE | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0228535 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *; | [DA]US4746850 (ABBONDANTI ALBERTO [US]) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0670627 (GRUNDIG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - OSTLUND S ET AL, "INITIAL ROTOR POSITION DETECTION FOR AN INTEGRATED PM SYNCHRONOUS MOTOR DRIVE", RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (IAS), ORLANDO, OCT. 8 - 12, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19951008), vol. 1, pages 741 - 747, XP000551001 [A] 1 * page 743, column L - page 744, column R * | [DA] - K. BACKHAUS ET AL, "A PROCEDURE TO ESTIMATE THE ABSOLUTE POSITION OF THE ROTOR FLUX OF A PERMANENT MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE", EPE'91, FIRENZE, IT, (1991), vol. 3, pages 659 - 663, XP000617549 [DA] 1 * the whole document * |