EP0874990 - STORAGE-STABLE PARTICLE, IN PARTICULAR CARRIER FOR CARRIER-BOUND REACTIONS, AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAID PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABION Beteiligungs- und Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Karl-Heinz-Beckurts-Strasse 3 52428 Jülich / DE | [2004/16] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states ABION Beteiligungs- und Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH K.-H.-Beckurts-Strasse 13 52428 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLAKSINE, Dmitri Wolfshovenerstrasse 2 D-52428 Jülich / DE | 02 /
GROMAKOVSKAIA, Elena Wolfshovenerstrasse 2 D-52428 Jülich / DE | 03 /
ERHARDT, Christoph, ABION Beteiligungs Verwalt. mbbH, Karl-Heinz-Beckurts-Strasse 13 D-52428 Jülich / DE | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Steglich, Gregor, et al Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Steglich, Gregor, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/45] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96939898.1 | 22.11.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996EP05161 | Priority number, date | DE1995143556 | 22.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19543556 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719354 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874990 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/546 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
G01N33/585 (EP,US);
Y10S530/812 (EP,US);
Y10S530/813 (EP,US);
Y10S530/814 (EP,US);
Y10S530/815 (EP,US);
Y10S530/816 (EP,US);
Y10S530/817 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | LAGERSTABILES PARTIKEL, INSBESONDERE TRÄGER FÜR TRÄGERGEBUNDENE REAKTIONEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/45] | English: | STORAGE-STABLE PARTICLE, IN PARTICULAR CARRIER FOR CARRIER-BOUND REACTIONS, AND METHODS OF PRODUCING SAID PARTICLE | [1998/45] | French: | PARTICULE STABLE AU STOCKAGE, NOTAMMENT SUPPORT SOUS FORME DE PARTICULE POUR DES REACTIONS LIEES AU SUPPORT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 02.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0184710 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 1-4,6-10,12,18,19,21,23-25 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 7 - line 11 ** page 11, line 20 - line 25; claims 8,14 *; | [DX]EP0321008 (HOLLAND BIOTECHNOLOGY [NL], et al) [DX] 1-4,6,9,12,19,23-25 * page 1, line 37 - line 39; claim 4 *; | [DX]WO9208134 (COULTER CORP [US]) [DX] 1-12,18-21,23-25 * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 * * page 11, line 35 - page 12, line 3 * * page 18 - page 24 * |