EP0863698 - CUTTING FILAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna Aktiebolag 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Husqvarna Aktiebolag 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Husqvarna Aktiebolag S-561 82 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGRAND, Emmanuel Le Bourg F-01480 Villeneuve / FR | 02 /
LANDEN, Göran Videgatan 12 S-561 38 Huskvarna / SE | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Erixon, Bo AB Electrolux Group Patents & Trademarks Postal Address 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Erixon, Bo AB Electrolux Group Patents & Trademarks Postal Address 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 96940232.0 | 29.11.1996 | [1998/38] | WO1996SE01580 | Priority number, date | FR19950014457 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: FR 9514457 | SE19960001287 | 03.04.1996 Original published format: SE 9601287 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719584 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863698 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863698 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/73 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
A01D34/4168 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1998/38] | Title | German: | FADENSCHNEIDER | [1998/38] | English: | CUTTING FILAMENT | [1998/38] | French: | FILAMENT DE COUPE | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 04.10.2001 | [2002/05] | Cited in | International search | [X]US4186239 ; | [X]US4054993 ; | [A]US5220774 |