EP0865564 - DOWN HOLE BYPASS VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith International, Inc. 16470 Hardy Street Houston, TX 77205-0068 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states SMITH INTERNATIONAL, INC. 16740 Hardy Street Houston, TX 77205-0068 / US | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states The Red Baron (Oil Tools Rental) Limited Blackness Avenue Altens Aberdeen AB1 4PG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGARIAN, Bruce 23 East Glebe Stonehaven Aberdeen AB3 2HW / GB | 02 /
TULLOCH, Rory, McCrae 20 Ashley Park North Aberdeen AB1 6SF / GB | 03 /
BARR, Lawrence, Robert Barclayhill Steading East Findon Aberdeen AB12 4RL / GB | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Goodenough, Nigel A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Goodenough, Nigel A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96940688.3 | 09.12.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996GB03027 | Priority number, date | GB19950025008 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9525008 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721020 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865564 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865564 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/10 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
E21B23/006 (EP,US);
E21B21/002 (EP,US);
E21B21/103 (EP,US);
E21B34/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [1998/39] | Title | German: | UMLAUFVENTIL IM BOHRLOCH | [1998/39] | English: | DOWN HOLE BYPASS VALVE | [1998/39] | French: | SOUPAPE DE DERIVATION POUR FOND DE PUITS | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 08.07.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4298077 (EMERY MAURICE M) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11 * column 6, line 36 - line 58 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 2 * [Y] 8,10; | [Y]US5271461 (DECKER KENNETH L [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column 9, line 29 - line 40 * * column 10, line 26 - column 12, line 52 *; | [Y]USRE17424E (PIVOTO) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 20 - line 34 *; | [A]FR2659384 (UNGEMACH PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 8 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 2 *; | [A]US4429755 (WILLIAMSON KIRK E [US]) [A] 10 * column 7, line 39 *; | [A]US4286659 (BOLDING JR BENSON H) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US4791991 (MORRIS ARTHUR J [US], et al) [A] 10 * column A *; | [A]US4633952 (RINGGENBERG PAUL D [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 19 *; | [A]US3823773 (NUTTER B) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 7 - line 27 * * column 6, line 51 - line 61 *; | [A]US5443129 (BAILEY THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 7, line 19 - line 34 *; | [PX]WO9630621 (UWG LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,3-7,11 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 4 * * page 5, line 13 - line 17 * |