Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0865564
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.05.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
18.05.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
11.05.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] |
19.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.01.2001 |
Application refused |
|
11.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2001 |
Application refused |
|
09.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.05.1999 |
First examination report |
|
14.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.03.1999 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
21.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.1998 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
07.08.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
07.08.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
13.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|