EP0871824 - CLAMPING DEVICE FOR RELEASABLY SECURING TWO SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMA INTERCONTINENTAL AG Rosenberg CH-9533 Kirchberg / CH | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRÄSSLE, Marcel Rosenbergstrasse 29 CH-9533 Kirchberg / CH | 02 /
ZÜLLIG, Kurt Rosenbergstrasse 23 CH-9533 Kirchberg / CH | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96940972.1 | 16.12.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996CH00440 | Priority number, date | CH19960000054 | 09.01.1996 Original published format: CH 5496 | CH19960001015 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: CH 101596 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725536 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871824 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871824 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [1998/43] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/43] | Extension states | RO | 27.05.1998 | Title | German: | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUM LÖSBAREN VERBINDEN ZWEIER PROFILSTÜCKE | [1998/43] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE FOR RELEASABLY SECURING TWO SECTIONS | [1998/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE POUR ASSEMBLAGE SEPARABLE DE DEUX PIECES PROFILEES | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.1998 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.09.1998 | 03.09.1998 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.09.1998 | 03.09.1998 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.09.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 14.11.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2152941 (SWOBODA HELLMUTH) [A] 1,2,12,13,17* the whole document *; | [A]EP0412339 (VIELER GERD & BERND KG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,7,16 * abstract *; | [A]DE4119326 (VIELER GERD & BERND KG [DE]) [A] 1,4,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4225926 (MERO RAUMSTRUKTUR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 27; figure - *; | [A]DE4328832 (F & T FORM & TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,13 * column 3, line 17 - column 7, line 65; figures 1-9 * |