EP0865290 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL USE INCLUDING AN NSAID AND CERAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [2004/10] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Sanofi-Synthélabo 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, Avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINIDORI, Claudine 110, rue de Bagneux F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al SYNTHELABO, Département Brevets, 22 avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | Application number, filing date | 96941107.3 | 04.12.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996FR01925 | Priority number, date | FR19950014392 | 06.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9514392 | [1998/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720572 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865290 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865290 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78, // (A61K35/78, 31:415),(A61K35/78, 31:19, A61P1:02) | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/68 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/39] | A61K35/78, // (A61K35/78, 31:415),(A61K35/78, 31:19) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | BUKKALES ARZNEIMITTEL, WELCHES EIN NSAID UND CERAMIDE ENTHÄLT | [1998/39] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL USE INCLUDING AN NSAID AND CERAMIDES | [1998/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR APPLICATION BUCCALE COMPRENANT UN NSAID ET DES CERAMIDES | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | GB | 03.03.2004 | IE | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | LU | 04.12.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
LU | 04.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9309805 (INOCOSM LAB [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 9, lines 11-14 ** claim 1 * |