EP0957785 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergström, Bo Kristinebergsgatan 11 792 34 Mora / SE | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Hammar, Ernst A Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Hammar, Ernst Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 96941272.5 | 28.11.1996 | [1999/47] | WO1996SE01560 | Priority number, date | SE19950004388 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: SE 9504388 | [1999/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720508 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957785 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28, A61B1/313 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/2812 (EP,US);
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B17/2841 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [1999/47] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [1999/47] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1997 | Translation filed | 29.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.05.1998 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 07.09.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9511620 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US], et al); | [A]US5304183 (GOURLAY STUART J [US], et al) |