EP0876171 - BLOOD OXYGENATOR AND HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Cardiovascular Systems Corporation 2101 Cottontail Lane Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2000/16] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONARD, Ronald, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96941418.4 | 18.11.1996 | [1998/46] | WO1996US18631 | Priority number, date | US19950565438 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: US 565438 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719714 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876171 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876171 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/18, B01D63/02 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
B01D63/026 (EP,US);
A61M1/1625 (EP,US);
A61M1/1629 (EP,US);
A61M1/1698 (EP,US);
A61M1/3623 (EP,US);
B01D63/034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/46] | Title | German: | BLUTOXYGENATOR UND WÄRMETAUSCHER | [1998/46] | English: | BLOOD OXYGENATOR AND HEAT EXCHANGER | [1998/46] | French: | OXYGENATEUR ET ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU SANG | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2000 | CH | 08.03.2000 | ES | 08.03.2000 | FI | 08.03.2000 | GR | 08.03.2000 | LI | 08.03.2000 | SE | 08.03.2000 | DK | 08.06.2000 | PT | 08.06.2000 | GB | 18.11.2000 | LU | 18.11.2000 | IE | 20.11.2000 | MC | 30.11.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
GR | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
DK | 08.06.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
MC | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
DK | 08.06.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
MC | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
MC | 30.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
IE | 20.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/12] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
GB | 18.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
FI | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6440060 ; | [A]US4715953 (LEONARD RONALD J [US]); | [DA]US4735775 (LEONARD RONALD J [US], et al); | [A]WO9004419 (BAXTER INT [US]); | [A]EP0621047 (COBE LAB [US]); | [DA]WO9511709 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) |