EP0861050 - KNOT TYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/36] | KNOT TYING METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
[2003/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pare Surgical, Inc. P.O.Box 3049 Englewood, CO 80155 / US | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEENOR, Richard, P. 5765 South Monaco Street Englewood, CO 80111 / US | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942003.3 | 12.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996US18331 | Priority number, date | US19950556662 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: US 556662 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717901 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861050 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861050 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/04 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
A61B17/062 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0483 (EP,US);
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B17/0467 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/30 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0474 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0475 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0479 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2933 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KNOTENKNÜPFEN | [2003/38] | English: | KNOT TYING APPARATUS | [2003/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR REALISER DES NOEUDS | [2003/38] |
Former [1998/36] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KNOTENKNÜPFEN | ||
Former [1998/36] | KNOT TYING METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [1998/36] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REALISER DES NOEUDS | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2003 | Decision despatched | 12.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4050465 (PERISSE PIERRE) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 4 - line 18 *; | [A]WO9519139 (CORAL MEDICAL [US]) [A] 1* page 5, line 19 - line 35 * | International search | [X]US5312423 (ROSENBLUTH ROBERT F [US], et al) | by applicant | US5084058 | US5129912 | US5133723 | US5163946 | US5192287 | US5217471 | US5234445 | US5234444 | - "A new cinch knot", OBSTETETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, (199107), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 144 - 47 | - "An improved needleholder for endoscopic knot typing", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, (199209), vol. 58, no. 3, pages 640 - 42 | - "Roder Knot for Tight Corners in Conventional Abdominal Surgery", J.R. COLL. SURG. VOL., (199112), vol. 36, page 412 | - "A simple method for ligating with straight and curved needles in operative Laparoscopy.", OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY, (1992), vol. 79, no. 1, pages 143 - 47 |