EP0955985 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING STRAIN OF THE EYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dipnall, Edward, Mathew, Fairlie 195 Dore Road Nar Nar Goon North, VIC 3812 / AU | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIPNALL, Edward, Mathew, Fairlie 195 Dore Road Nar Nar Goon North, VIC 3812 / AU | 02 /
JORDAN, Steven 20 Coolaroo Crescent Mooroolbark, VIC 3138 / AU | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942182.5 | 20.12.1996 | [1999/46] | WO1996AU00829 | Priority number, date | AU1995PN07241 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: AU PN724195 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723188 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955985 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61H5/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A61H5/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM VERMINDERN DER AUGENERMÜDUNG | [1999/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING STRAIN OF THE EYES | [1999/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA FATIGUE OCULAIRE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 22.01.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB442956 (ROBERT BROOKS SIMPKINS) [A] 6,19 * page 1, line 65 - line 99; figure - *; | [A]US5200859 (PAYNER LEONARD E [US], et al) [A] 13,27* column A; figure - *; | [X]US5422688 (ASEA MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-3,14-16,26 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 38; figure - * | International search | [X]DE2328762 ; | [A]AU7771575 ; | [X]US2785671 (VICKERS HARRY F); | [X]US3875934 (SADANAGA KAZUKIYO); | [A]DE3617416 (WARNKE EGON FRED [DE]); | [X]GB2203565 (AYETECH INC); | [A]WO9100553 (BONHAM CELESTE VIRGINIA [US]) | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 75-A5856W/03; & DE,A,2 328 762 (A H KLETT) 9 January 1975., & DE2328762 A 00000000 |