EP0868229 - OBJECT-SEPARATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMTEC Magnetics GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 52 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2000/13] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states EMTEC Magnetics GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Str. 52 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLATTER, Manfred Malteserordenstrasse 1e 79111 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Norbert Maximilianstrasse 23 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 03 /
HOEFER, Gerhardt Seitmannsdorfer Strasse 78a 96450 Coburg / DE | [1998/41] | Application number, filing date | 96942294.8 | 02.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996EP05328 | Priority number, date | DE1995219170U | 04.12.1995 Original published format: DE 29519170 U | [1998/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9720646 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868229 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868229 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B09B5/00, B23P19/04 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
B09B5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23P19/04 (KR);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29L2007/00 (EP,US);
B29L2017/00 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/41] | Title | German: | TRENNVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GEGENSTAND | [1998/41] | English: | OBJECT-SEPARATING DEVICE | [1998/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA SEPARATION D'UN OBJET | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2534705 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 5-7 *; | [X]EP0469676 (SMIT GERARDUS [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0639406 (BASF MAGNETICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 45 * |