Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0863948
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
09.06.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
25.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
06.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.10.1998 |
First examination report |
|
16.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.07.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] |
31.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] |
22.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|