Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9825200 | Global Dossier | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9605381 | 03.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1175097 | Global Dossier | 29.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9605381 | 03.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0943125 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | B1 | EP0943125 | 22.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9605381 | 03.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59608032D1 | 29.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9605381 | 03.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6870518 | 22.03.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9605381 | 03.12.1996 |