Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0885240
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.11.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
24.11.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
24.11.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
27.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.09.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
13.09.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
29.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.04.1999 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
06.11.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
05.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
10.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|