Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4076098B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | B2 | JP2000511878 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU709171B | Global Dossier | 26.08.1999 | B2 | AU1175897 | 02.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0885240 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2001 | B1 | EP0885240 | 23.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | EP96942325 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE198600T | 15.01.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2246520 | 02.03.2004 | C | CA2246520 | 21.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69611548T | 07.06.2001 | T2 | DE69611548D1 | 15.02.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0885240T | 29.01.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA000789 | 24.04.2000 | B1 | EA199800732 | 25.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3035208T | 30.04.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | EP96942325 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1018276 | 17.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU226936 | 29.03.2010 | B1 | HUP9904410 | 28.05.2002 | A3 | HUP9904410 | 28.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL125414 | 31.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO311029B | 01.10.2001 | B1 | NO983665L | 11.08.1998 | L | NO983665D0 | 11.08.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ324300 | 25.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6228851 | 08.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | EP9605392 | 04.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9730068 | Global Dossier | 21.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1131236C | 17.12.2003 | C | CN1209137 | 24.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2153996T | 16.03.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100440352B | 18.09.2004 | B1 | KR19990082445 | 25.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT885240E | 30.04.2001 | E | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA971214 | 19.11.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96102325 | 16.02.1996 |