Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | CH | | DE | | DK | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | SE | | Examination procedure | 04.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | | 30.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 30.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 10.01.2001 | Opposition procedure | 11.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.05.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 02.09.2002 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | AVENTIS BULK S.P.A. | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT PC4A | Code Expl.: | TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT | Free Format Text: | AVENTIS BULK S.P.A. IT | Effective DATE: | 20021119 | | Event date: | 23.12.1998 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 23.12.1998 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL PAYMENT 980730;LT PAYMENT 980730;LV PAYMENT 980730;RO PAYMENT 980730;SI PAYMENT 980730 | | Event date: | 23.12.1998 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19980730 | | Event date: | 19.05.1999 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19990331 | | Event date: | 10.01.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Event date: | 10.01.2001 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL PAYMENT 19980730;LT PAYMENT 19980730;LV PAYMENT 19980730;RO PAYMENT 19980730;SI PAYMENT 19980730 | | Event date: | 10.01.2001 | | Event description: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | | Event date: | 10.01.2001 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 198600 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20010115 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 15.01.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 29.01.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 07.02.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 15.02.2001 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69611548 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20010215 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 28.02.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI | | Event date: | 16.03.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2153996 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 19.03.2001 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Event date: | 30.03.2001 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 30.04.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20010117 | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 02.01.2002 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Event date: | 30.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 15.04.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | GRUPPO LEPETIT S.P.A. TRANSFER- AVENTIS BULK S.P.A | | Event date: | 06.12.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 23.02.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 23.02.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | | Event date: | 28.02.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | SANOFI AVENTIS SPA | Free Format Text: | AVENTIS BULK S.P.A.#PIAZZA STEFANO TUERR 5#20149 MILANO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- SANOFI AVENTIS SPA#VIALE L. BODIO NO 37/B#MILANO 20158 (IT) | | Event date: | 28.02.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT PC4A | Code Expl.: | TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | SANOFI - AVENTIS SPA, IT | Effective DATE: | 20070209 | | Event date: | 02.06.2008 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | AVENTIS PHARMA S.P.A. | Effective DATE: | 20080404 | | Event date: | 02.06.2008 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1 | OWNER: | SANOFI-AVENTIS S.P.A. | | Event date: | 10.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20151209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20151201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20151210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20151202 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20151112 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20151211 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20151209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20151207 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20151211 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20151111 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20151203 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20151110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20151028 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20151210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20151125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.03.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20160106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20151221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 04.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69611548 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 05.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EUP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT EXPIRED | Effective DATE: | 20161204 | | Event date: | 07.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20161203 | | Event date: | 15.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 28.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20161203 | | Event date: | 15.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 198600 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20161204 | | Event date: | 25.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MK9A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | | Event date: | 31.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 31.01.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20161203 | | Event date: | 02.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR MA 20000402867 GR | Code Expl.: | -RIGHT EXPIRED | Effective DATE: | 20161205 | | Event date: | 28.02.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20161204 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20161205 | | Event date: | 24.11.2000 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 13.09.2000 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 29.11.1999 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 29.11.1999 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 18.10.1999 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 30.03.1999 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 06.11.1998 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 16.11.2001 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 16.11.2001 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |