EP0885240 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF 11BETA-21-DIHYDROXY-2'-METHYL-5'BETAH-PREGNA-1,4-DIENO[17,16-D]OXAZOLE-3,20-DIONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUPPO LEPETIT S.P.A. 8, Via R. Lepetit 20020 Lainate (MI) / IT | [1998/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORTE, Luigi Via Unione Sovietica, 4 I-72100 Brindisi / IT | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/04] | Macchetta, Francesco GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A., Patent Department, Piazza Türr 5 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96942325.0 | 04.12.1996 | [1998/52] | WO1996EP05392 | Priority number, date | EP19960102325 | 16.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96102325 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730068 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885240 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885240 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07J71/00 | [1998/52] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/52] | Extension states | AL | 30.07.1998 | LT | 30.07.1998 | LV | 30.07.1998 | RO | 30.07.1998 | SI | 30.07.1998 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON 11BETA-21-DIHYDROXY-2'-METHYL-5'-BETAH-PREGNA-1,4-DIENO[17,16-D]-OXAZOLE-3, 20-DIONE | [1998/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF 11BETA-21-DIHYDROXY-2'-METHYL-5'BETAH-PREGNA-1,4-DIENO[17,16-D]OXAZOLE-3,20-DIONE | [1998/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE 11BETA-21-DIHYDROXY-2'-METHYL-5'-BETAH-PREGNA-1,43-DIENO[17,16-D]OXAZOLE-3,20-DIONE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - A. SANTOS-MONTES ET AL, "Extraction and High-Performance Liquid Chromatographic Separation of Deflazacort and its Metabolite 21-Hydroxydeflazacort Application to Urine Samples", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOCHEMICAL APPLICATIONS, SCIENCE PUBLISHERS NL, (19940701), vol. 657, no. 1, pages 248 - 253, XP002025545 [X] 1-12 * page 250, paragraph 2.4 * * page 250, paragraph 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(94)80096-0 | [L] - A. SANTOS-MONTES, "Solvent and Solid Phase Extraction of Natural and Synthetic Corticoids in Human Urine", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOCHEMICAL APPLICATIONS, SCIENCE PUBLISHERS NL, (19940114), vol. 652, no. 1, pages 83 - 89, XP002025546 [L] 1-12 * page 85, paragraph 2.7 * * this document is specifically referred to in the above document J. Chromatogr. B. Vol 657(1), pp 248-253, for the extraction techniques * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(93)E0396-8 | [X] - E. MARTINELLI ET AL, "Metabolism of Deflazacort in the Rat, Dog and Man", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, (197909), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 335 - 339, XP000618315 [X] 1-12 * page 336, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * | [X] - A. ASSANDRI ET AL, "Disposition and Metabolism of A New Steroidal Anti-Inflammatory Agent, Deflazacort, in Cynomolgus Monkeys", XENOBIOTICA, (198303), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 185 - 196, XP000618316 [X] 1-12 * page 186 * |