EP0881219 - N-SUBSTITUTED DIOXOTHIAZOLIDYLBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Toshio 1-5-18, Wakagi Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Masahiro 6095, Tomonuma Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-01 / JP | 03 /
AWANO, Katsuya 352-22, Kizawa Oyama-shi Tochigi 323 / JP | 04 /
KINOSHITA, Susumu 3-10-10, Shinshiraoka Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama 349-02 / JP | 05 /
SATOH, Hiroya 4660-4, Tomonuma Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-01 / JP | 06 /
MURAKAMI, Koji Prescene Nogi Highlands 704 386-2, Marubayashi Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-01 / JP | 07 /
TSUNODA, Masaki 5932, Tomonuma Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-01 / JP | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942555.2 | 16.12.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996JP03664 | Priority number, date | JP19950348341 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34834195 | [1998/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722600 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881219 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881219 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/34, C07D417/12, A61K31/425, A61K31/44, // (C07D417/12, 277:00, 213:00) | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D277/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/425 (KR);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | C07D277/34, C07D417/12, A61K31/425, A61K31/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Title | German: | N-SUBSTITUIERTE DIOXOTHIAZOLIDYL-BENZAMID-DERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/49] | English: | N-SUBSTITUTED DIOXOTHIAZOLIDYLBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1998/49] | French: | DERIVES DE LA DIOXOTHIAZOLIDYLBENZAMIDE SUBSTITUES EN N ET LEUR PROCEDE D'OBTENTION | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1998 | Translation filed | 17.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | ES | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | IE | 16.12.2004 | LU | 16.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.12.2004 | ||
LU | 16.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 16.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0033617 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0332331 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0526658 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * examples 30,40,42,47-51 *; | [D]JPH0592960 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [A] - SOHDA T ET AL, "STUDIES ON ANTIDIABETIC AGENTS. III. 5-ARYLTHIAZOLIDINE-2,4-DIONES AS POTENT ALDOSE REDUCTASE INHIBITORS", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN,JP,PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO, (1982), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0009-2363, page 3601-3616, XP002024094 [A] 1-8 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890424), vol. 110, no. 17, Database accession no. 150323, XP002123273 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - G. KLOPMAN ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 852 - 862 | International search | [Y]JPS5728073 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, et al); | [A]JPH01299289 (PFIZER); | [A]WO9214719 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [A]JPH06502144 ; | [A]JPH07309852 (ADIR) |