EP0817548 - PRINTED WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kanda-cho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kanda-cho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1, Kanda-cho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Yoji Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawacho Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-06 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Yoichiro Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawacho Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-06 / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942586.7 | 19.12.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996JP03718 | Priority number, date | JP19960021965 | 11.01.1996 Original published format: JP 2196596 | JP19960037155 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: JP 3715596 | JP19960075297 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7529796 | [1998/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725839 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817548 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817548 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K3/46 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
H05K1/116 (EP,US);
H05K1/02 (KR);
H05K1/0201 (EP,US);
H05K1/0224 (EP,US);
H05K1/115 (EP,US);
H05K3/4602 (EP,US);
H05K1/0253 (EP,US);
H05K2201/062 (EP,US);
H05K2201/093 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09454 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09536 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0959 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09627 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09681 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09727 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0979 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09881 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, NL [1998/02] | Title | German: | GEDRUCKTE SCHALTUNGSPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/02] | English: | PRINTED WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1998/02] | French: | TABLEAU D'INTERCONNEXIONS IMPRIME ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1997 | Translation filed | 29.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05027867.0 / EP1677582 | EP08011580.1 / EP1981317 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0605399 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 18 - column 7, line 3; figure 4 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JPH07202433 ; | [YA]JPS64795 ; | [YX]JPH04192495 ; | [YX]JPH03142896 ; | [A]JPH06302964 ; | [AX]US5110654 (YOKOKAWA SAKAE [JP]) [A] 24 * figure - * [X] 25,26; | [AX]EP0457583 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 24 * figure - * [X] 25; | [A]FR2468279 (DUJARDIN EDITIONS [FR]) [A] 24-26 * figure - *; | [A]JPS6437073 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 95, no. 11, & JP07202433 A 19950804 (IBIDEN CO) [Y] 2-6,8 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890420), vol. 13, no. 166, Database accession no. (E - 746), & JP64000795 A 19890105 (IBIDEN CO) [Y] 4-6,8 * abstract * [A] 7 | [YX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921022), vol. 16, no. 513, Database accession no. (E - 1283), & JP04192495 A 19920710 (FUJITSU) [Y] 11,13,14,16,20,24 * abstract * [X] 21,23 | [AY] - "Formation of Surface Laminar Circuit on Printed Circuit Board with Plated Through Holes", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, (199310), vol. 36, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, page 511, XP000412466 [A] 9 * the whole document * [Y] 11,13,14,16,20 | [YX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910913), vol. 15, no. 365, Database accession no. (E - 1111), & JP03142896 A 19910618 (FUJITSU) [Y] 24 * abstract * [X] 25 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 95, no. 1, & JP06302964 A 19941028 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 9,10,18,19,22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890526), vol. 13, no. 230, Database accession no. (E - 764), & JP01037073 A 19890207 (SONY CORP) [A] 24-26 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07321463 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0543569U ; | [A]JPS59182974U ; | [A]JPH06314865 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06132667 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05183273 (HITACHI LTD) |