EP0794012 - PAINT DRYING OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIKISHA, LTD. 6-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states Taikisha, Ltd. 6-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Makoto 6-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | 02 /
OHASHI, Isao 6-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | 03 /
UMEDA, Hisashi 13, Kuroda Higashihazu Hazu-cho Hazu-gun Aichi 444-07 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Koji 302-2, Moritakahigashi 1-chome Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 463 / JP | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942979.4 | 02.10.1996 | [1997/37] | WO1996JP02884 | Priority number, date | JP19950257348 | 04.10.1995 Original published format: JP 25734895 | [1997/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712691 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794012 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794012 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05C9/14, F26B13/10, F26B21/04, F26B23/10, F26B3/30 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
F26B23/022 (EP,US);
F26B21/04 (EP,US);
F26B3/283 (EP,US);
F26B3/305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/37] | B05C9/14, F26B13/10, F26B21/04, F26B23/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, NL, PT, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | OFEN ZUM TROCKNEN VON FARBE | [1997/37] | English: | PAINT DRYING OVEN | [1997/37] | French: | ETUVE DE SECHAGE DE PEINTURE | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1997 | Translation filed | 07.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 28.09.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2000 | BE | 27.12.2000 | NL | 27.12.2000 | DK | 27.03.2001 | PT | 27.03.2001 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
NL | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8000183 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 3 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8100448 (KARLSSON A); | [A]GB2059032 (CARRIER DRYSYS LTD); | [A]US4785552 (BEST WILLIE H [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0336120 (VITS MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 9, line 25 - line 41; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0390231 (BEST WILLIE H [US]); | [A]US4972606 (STOLTZ CARL R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [PA]EP0706021 (DUERR GMBH & CO [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9621833 (ABB PAINT FINISHING INC [US]) [PA] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS60193272U ; | [A]JPS61161173 (TRINITY IND CORP, et al); | [A]JPS61174967 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPS61185359 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]JPS61142294U ; | [A]JPH0290970 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [A]JPH0348696U ; | [A]JPH04141273 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [A]JPH0531435 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JPH07155672 (TRINITY IND CORP) |