EP0868434 - ANTI-IDIOTYPIC ANTIBODIES OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR AND USE THEREOF AS DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLOUET, Jean 29, rue Noulet F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
JONCA, Frédéric 12, place Marnac F-31520 Ramonville-Saint-Agne / FR | 03 /
ORTEGA, Nathalie Appartement 3, 10, rue Elvire F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
RUCHOUX, Marie-Magdeleine 50, rue Croix-Pasquier F-37100 Tours / FR | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54 Rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/41] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy s.a.r.l., 103 rue La Fayette 75481 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96943157.6 | 20.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996FR02041 | Priority number, date | FR19950015243 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9515243 | [1998/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723510 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868434 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868434 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/42, A61K39/395, A61K47/48, A61K51/10, G01N33/53 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/4241 (EP,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | VASKULARE ENDOTHELZELLE-WACHSTUMSFAKTOR ANTIIDOTYPISCHE ANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [1998/41] | English: | ANTI-IDIOTYPIC ANTIBODIES OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR AND USE THEREOF AS DRUGS | [1998/41] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-IDIOTYPIQUES DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ENDOTHELIALE VASCULAIRE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.01.2003 | SE | 09.01.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0502416 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] * page 3, line 36 - line 53 *; | [A]WO9411499 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] * page 3, line 2 - line 26 * * page 23, line 3 - page 24, line 12 * * page 26, line 28 - page 28, line 33 * * page 34, line 11 - page 35, line 7 *; | [X] - PLOUET ET AL, "VEGF DEPENDENT TUMORAL PROGRESSION: STIMULATION BY ANTI VEGF IDIOTYPIC ANTIBODIES", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY.SUPPLEMENT 18A, (1994), page 328, XP000602723 [X] 1-15 * abrégé EZ311 * | [DA] - TERMAN ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF THE KDR TYROSINE KINASE AS A RECEPTOR FOR VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL CELL GROWTH FACTOR", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1992), vol. 187, pages 1579 - 1586, XP002013861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(92)90483-2 | [DA] - MILLAUER ET AL, "HIGH AFFINITY VEGF BINDING AND DEVELOPMENTAL EXRPESSSION SUGGEST FLK-1 AS A MAJOR REGULATOR OF VASCULOGENESIS AND ANGIOGENESIS", CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 835 - 846, XP002013862 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90573-9 | [DA] - MILLAUER ET AL, "GLIOBLASTOMA GROWTH INHIBITED IN VIVO BY A DOMINANT-NEGATIVE FLK-1 MUTANT", NATURE, (1994), vol. 367, pages 576 - 579, XP002013863 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/367576a0 | [DA] - JIN KIM ET AL, "INHIBITION OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-INDUCED ANGIOGENESIS SUPPRESSES TUMOUR GROWTH IN VIVO", NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 841 - 844, XP002013864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/362841a0 | [A] - CHAGNAUD ET AL, "CURATIVE EFFECTS ON RAT SARCOMAS OBTAINED AFTER A TREATMENT COMBINING TWO MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (1994), vol. 5, pages 361 - 366, XP000601953 [A] * page 361,abrégé,page 365,'conclusion' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-199406000-00015 | [PX] - ORT GA ET AL, "MODULATION DE LA PROGRESSION TUMORALE PAR DES ANTICORPS ANTI-IDIOTYPIQUES DE FACTEURS ANGIOG NIQUES", C.R.ACAD.SCI.PARIS,SCIENCE DE LA VIE, (199605), vol. 319, pages 411 - 415, XP000601935 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * |