EP0868244 - ROTARY CUTTING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ) 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [1998/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARPER, Clive 151 Melbourne Road, Blacon Chester CH1 5JH / GB | 02 /
YATES, John 57 Reynard Close, Webheath Redditch, Worcestershire B97 6PY / GB | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 96943429.9 | 12.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996SE01643 | Priority number, date | GB19950026197 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9526197 | GB19960023170 | 06.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9623170 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723323 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868244 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868244 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/16 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
B23C5/2204 (EP,US);
B23C5/109 (EP,US);
B23C5/2213 (EP,US);
B23C2200/0416 (EP,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1908 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | DREHENDE SCHNEIDWERKZEUGE | [1998/41] | English: | ROTARY CUTTING TOOLS | [1998/41] | French: | OUTILS DE COUPE TOURNANTS | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.05.2002 | [2002/37] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0181844 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]); | [A]GB2186220 (MARWIN CUTTING TOOLS LTD); | [A]US5340246 (TUKALA TOMMY [SE]); | [A]US4966500 (TSUJIMURA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [A]US5213452 (KIRBY MARK [GB]); | [A]US4300862 (YADA HIROSHI) |