EP0863885 - NOVEL MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company 203 Longmeadow Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2002/19] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Dupont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Chu-Biao 11 Rivendell Court Hockessin, DE 19707-2400 / US | 02 /
CHERNEY, Robert, Joseph 104 Bridleshire Court Newark, DE 19711-2449 / US | 03 /
DeCICCO, Carl, Peter 17 Ridgewood Turn Newark, DE 19711-8300 / US | 04 /
DeGRADO, William, Frank 502 Bancroft Road Media, PA 19063-4207 / US | 05 /
HE, Xiaohua 12 Old Flint Circle Hockessin, DE 19707-1406 / US | 06 /
HODGE, Carl, Nicolas 1798 Altschul Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 07 /
JACOBSON, Irina, Cipora 3205 Heathwood Road Wilmington, DE 19810-3427 / US | 08 /
MAGOLDA, Ronald, Louis 3 Church Road Wallingford, PA 19086-6209 / US | 09 /
ARNER, Elizabeth, Catherine 386 South Jennersville Road West Grove, PA 19390-9412 / US | 10 /
DUAN, Jingwu 17 Springbrook Lane Newark, DE 19711-2497 / US | 11 /
NELSON, David, J. 40 Tiverton Circle Newark, DE 19702-1444 / US | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/38] | 01 /
XUE, Chu-Biao 11 Rivendell Court Hockessin, DE 19707-2400 / US | ||
02 /
CHERNEY, Robert, Joseph 104 Bridleshire Court Newark, DE 19711-2449 / US | |||
03 /
DeCICCO, Carl, Peter 17 Ridgewood Turn Newark, DE 19711-8300 / US | |||
04 /
DeGRADO, William, Frank 502 Bancroft Road Media, PA 19063-4207 / US | |||
05 /
HE, Xiaohua 12 Old Flint Circle Hockessin, DE 19707-1406 / US | |||
06 /
HODGE, Carl, Nicolas 4509 Birch Circle Wilmington, DE 19808-2967 / US | |||
07 /
JACOBSON, Irina, Cipora 3205 Heathwood Road Wilmington, DE 19810-3427 / US | |||
08 /
MAGOLDA, Ronald, Louis 3 Church Road Wallingford, PA 19086-6209 / US | |||
09 /
ARNER, Elizabeth, Catherine 386 South Jennersville Road West Grove, PA 19390-9412 / US | |||
10 /
DUAN, Jingwu 17 Springbrook Lane Newark, DE 19711-2497 / US | |||
11 /
NELSON, David, J. 40 Tiverton Circle Newark, DE 19702-1444 / US | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1998/38] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96943497.6 | 13.11.1996 | [1998/38] | WO1996US18382 | Priority number, date | US19950006684P | 14.11.1995 Original published format: US 6684 P | US19960646902 | 08.05.1996 Original published format: US 646902 | US19960743439 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: US 743439 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9718207 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863885 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D267/00, C07D273/02, C07D291/02, C07D245/02, C07D255/02, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D419/12, C07D498/08, C07K5/06, A61K31/395, A61K38/05, C12Q1/37, // (C07D498/08, 273:00, 209:00) | [1998/38] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D245/02 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D255/02 (EP);
C07D267/00 (EP);
C07D273/02 (EP);
C07D291/02 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07D419/12 (EP);
C07K5/0606 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
C07K5/06191 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/38] | Title | German: | NEUE MAKROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS METALLOPROTEASE-INHIBITOREN | [2002/48] | English: | NOVEL MACROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS | [1998/38] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES MACROCYCLIQUES TENANT LIEU D'INHIBITEURS DE LA METALLOPROTEASE | [1998/38] |
Former [1998/38] | NEUUE MAKROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS METALLOPROTEASE-INHIBITOREN | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/36] | Request for further processing for: | 23.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9213831 (BRITISH BIO TECHNOLOGY [GB]) [DA] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]US5427954 (SANDY JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 32 * claim 1 *; | [DX] - LOHMANDER, L.S. ET AL., "The structure of aagrecan fragments in human synovial fluid", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1993), vol. 36, pages 1214 - 1222, XP002038145 [DX] 32 * page 1214, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 1215, column L * * tables 2,3 * | [A] - HUGHES, CLARE E. ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies that specifically recognize neoepitope sequences generated by 'aggrecanase' and matrix metalloproteinase cleavage of aggrecan: application in situ and in vitro", BIOCHEM. J. (1995), 305(3), 799-804 CODEN: BIJOAK;ISSN: 0264-6021, (1995), XP002037744 [A] 32 * the whole document * | [A] - LARK, MICHAEL W. ET AL, "Cell-mediated catabolism of aggrecan. Evidence that cleavage at the "aggrecanase" site (Glu373-Ala374) is a primary event in proteolysis of the interglobular domain", J. BIOL. CHEM. (1995), 270(6), 2550-6 CODEN: JBCHA3;ISSN: 0021-9258, (1995), XP002037745 [A] 32 * the whole document * | [A] - FOSANG, AMANDA J. ET AL, "Neutrophil collagenase (MMP-8) cleaves at the aggrecanase site E373-A374 in the interglobular domain of cartilage aggrecan", BIOCHEM. J. (1994), 304(2), 347-51 CODEN: BIJOAK;ISSN: 0264-6021, (1994), XP002037746 [A] 32 * the whole document * | [A] - MURPHY G ET AL, "THE N-TERMINAL DOMAIN OF TISSUE INHIBITOR OF METALLOPROTEINASES RETAINS METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19910820), vol. 30, no. 33, pages 8097 - 8102, XP000218096 [A] 32 * INHIBITOR ASSAY; page 8098, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00247a001 |