EP0866779 - METHODS FOR IMPROVED RHEOLOGICAL CONTROL IN CEMENTITIOUS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKAGGS, Bryan 11390 Turtleneck Lane San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
RAKITSKY, Walter 7271 Enders Avenue San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
PHYFFEROEN, Alain 1 Feroners Close,Furnace Green Crawley-Sussex RH10 6EA / GB | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1998/40] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International SA Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 96943562.7 | 13.12.1996 | [1998/40] | WO1996US19227 | Priority number, date | US19950573112 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: US 573112 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722564 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0866779 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0866779 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/38, C04B28/02, // (C04B28/02, 24:38) | [1998/40] | CPC: |
C09K8/514 (EP,US);
C04B24/38 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09K8/206 (EP,US);
C09K8/46 (EP,US);
C04B2103/0079 (EP,US);
C04B2103/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B24/24, C04B24/38, C04B2103/408 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B24/38, C04B24/383, C04B2103/408 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN RHEOLOGISCHEN STEUERUNG BEI ZEMENTSYSTEMEN | [1998/40] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVED RHEOLOGICAL CONTROL IN CEMENTITIOUS SYSTEMS | [1998/40] | French: | PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA REGULATION RHEOLOGIQUE DANS DES SYSTEMES CIMENTAIRES | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.03.2000 | GR | 22.03.2000 | DK | 22.06.2000 | PT | 23.06.2000 | SE | 14.12.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/46] | FI | 22.03.2000 | |
DK | 22.06.2000 | ||
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
SE | 14.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/05] | FI | 22.03.2000 | |
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
SE | 14.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 22.03.2000 | |
PT | 23.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | PT | 23.06.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4487864 (BERMUDEZ MAURICIO [US], et al) [A] 25* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 15; claim - *; | [DA]US5175278 (PEIK JERRY A [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,5,10-12,18-21 * column 5, line 23 - line 49 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 39; examples 4-6 *; | [Y]US5180430 (GARTNER ELLIS M [US], et al) [Y] 6-9,22-24 * claim - *; | [Y] - "BLENDS OF MICROBIAL POLYSACCHARIDES WITH CELLULOSIC DERIVATIVES FOR CEMENTITIOUS APPLICATIONS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19931001), no. 354, page 672, XP000412828 [Y] 1-5,10-21,27-30 * the whole document * | [YD] - R.MOORHOUSE, "Structure/Property Relationships of a Family of Microbial Polysaccharides", INDUSTRIAL POLAYSACCHARIDES: GENETIC ENGINEERING, STRUCTURE/PROPERTY RELATIONS AND APPLICATIONS, EDITED BY M.YALPANI, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM,NL, (1987), pages 187 - 206, XP000670613 [YD] 1-5,10-21,27-30 * see page 189, (d) * * page 190, paragraph 4 * * page 199, line L - page 200, line L * [Y] 6-9,22-24 |