blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0869922

EP0869922 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING MINERAL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bürger, Gerhard
Klingenbergstrasse 42
31139 Hildesheim / DE
For all designated states
Gorobinskaya, Valentina
ul. Wassilenko, 25
Kiew, 252124 / UA
[1998/42]
Inventor(s)01 / GOROBINSKAYA, Valentina
ul. Wassilenko, 25
Kiew, 252124 / UA
02 / THAMM, Dirk
Wilhelmsmühlenweg 46
D-12621 Berlin / DE
03 / KRAVTCHENKO, Irina
Ernst-Schneller-Strasse 10
D-07747 Jena / DE
04 / SOJREF, Dalik
Alt Friedrichsfelde 38
D-10315 Berlin / DE
05 / MEDWEDJEW, Alexander
ul. Lipskogo 12/5-9
Kiew, 252025 / UA
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al
Anwaltskanzlei
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al
Patentanwälte Felke & Walter Normannenstrasse 1-2
10367 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date96943872.009.10.1996
[1998/42]
WO1996DE01974
Priority number, dateDE1995103859909.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19538599
[1998/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9713729
Date:17.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0869922
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0869922
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.1997
ClassificationIPC:C03B37/08, C03B5/04
[1998/42]
CPC:
C03B37/08 (EP,US); C03B5/04 (EP,US); C03B5/26 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MINERALFASERN[1998/42]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING MINERAL FIBRES[1998/42]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE FIBRES MINERALES[1998/42]
Entry into regional phase08.05.1998National basic fee paid 
08.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
07.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/42]
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
11.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.1999Fee for grant paid
12.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S
Hovedgaden 584
2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/30]
Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S
Hovedgaden 584
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Barz, Peter
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Former [2001/02]
Opponent(s)01  08.11.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
ROCKWOOL International A/S
Hovedgaden 584
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Barz, Peter
Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
15.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.04.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/10]
09.12.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.12.2002Appeal received No.  T1202/02
14.02.2003Statement of grounds filed
09.12.2004Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
09.12.2004Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES09.02.2000
GR09.02.2000
IT09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
[2008/07]
Former [2004/07]ES09.02.2000
GR09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
Former [2002/27]ES09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
Former [2001/09]PT09.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9221628  (MEDVEDEV ALEXANDR ALEXANDROVIC [RU], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4675039  (HUEY LARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * column W *;
 [A]US3985530  (HYND WILLIAM CHRISTIE) [A] 1,17 * column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.