EP0869982 - ISOCYANATE MASKING PROCEDURE, USE OF OXIMES IN ISOCYANATE MASKING, MASKED ISOCYANATES AND THEIR USE IN MANUFACTURE OF COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Jean-Marie Route du Marge Saint-Laurent-d'Agny F-69440 Mornant / FR | 02 /
PERROUD, Eugénie 52, rue d'Inkermann F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Ricalens, François, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2009/28] |
Former [1998/42] | Ricalens, François, et al RHODIA CHIMIE Direction de la Propriéte Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96944090.8 | 27.12.1996 | [1998/42] | WO1996FR02090 | Priority number, date | FR19950015709 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9515709 | [1998/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724386 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869982 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869982 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/80 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
C08G18/8077 (EP,US);
C08G18/80 (KR);
C07C271/60 (KR);
C08G18/83 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MASKIERUNG VON ISOCYANAT, VERWENDUNG VON OXIMEN ZUR MASKIERUNG VON ISOCYANAT, MASKIERTE ISOCYANATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGEN | [1998/42] | English: | ISOCYANATE MASKING PROCEDURE, USE OF OXIMES IN ISOCYANATE MASKING, MASKED ISOCYANATES AND THEIR USE IN MANUFACTURE OF COATING MATERIALS | [1998/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE MASQUAGE D'ISOCYANATE, UTILISATION D'OXYMES POUR LE MASQUAGE D'ISOCYANATE, ISOCYANATES ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS DANS LA FABRICATION DE REVETEMENT | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2001 | Decision despatched | 09.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 27.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.03.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/01] | GR | 19.03.2003 | |
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 19.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | JPS4928255 [ ] (TAKEDA CHEMICAL); | [A]EP0246071 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]WO9415984 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 6; claims 1-3 *; | [A] - WAKIMOTO ET AL, "PAINT COMPOSITIONS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19750616), vol. 82, no. 12, Database accession no. 157929a, page 96, column 1, XP002013295 [A] 1 * abstract * |