EP0874917 - PROCESS TO ENHANCE THE PAINTBAKE RESPONSE AND AGING STABILITY OF ALUMINUM SHEET MATERIALS AND PRODUCT THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/45] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS TO ENHANCE THE PAINTBAKE RESPONSE AND AGING STABILITY OF ALUMINUM SHEET MATERIALS AND PRODUCT THEREFROM | ||
[2010/41] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds Metals Company Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond Virginia 23230-1701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230-1701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYANT, J., Daniel 2304 Birnam Woods Terrace Midlothian, VA 23112 / US | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Hideo 1-18-5, Yukimi-cho Showa-ku Nagoya 466 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Hidetoshi 2-16, Shoei-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 200 221 40100 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 11 01 23 40501 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/47] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2001/26] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1998/45] | Woodcraft, David Charles BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96944361.3 | 17.12.1996 | [1998/45] | WO1996US19878 | Priority number, date | US19950573895 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: US 573895 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722724 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874917 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874917 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/05 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
C21D9/56 (EP,US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (EP,US);
C21D9/60 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | C21D9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND DER ALTERUNGSSTABILITÄT VON ALUMINIUMBLECHEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER PRODUKTE | [2010/41] | English: | PROCESS TO ENHANCE THE PAINTBAKE RESPONSE AND AGING STABILITY OF ALUMINUM SHEET MATERIALS AND PRODUCT THEREFROM | [2010/41] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA TENUE DU RENFORCEMENT A CHAUD ET DE LA STABILITE AU VIEILLISSEMENT DES TOLES D'ALUMINIUM ET DES PRODUITS DERIVES DE CES TOLES | [2010/41] |
Former [1998/45] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND DER ALTERUNGSSTABILITÄT VON ALUMINIUMBLECHEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER PRODUKTE | ||
Former [1998/45] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS TO ENHANCE THE PAINTBAKE RESPONSE AND AGING STABILITY OF ALUMINUM SHEET MATERIALS AND PRODUCT THEREFROM | ||
Former [1998/45] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AMELIORATION DE LA TENUE DU RENFORCEMENT A CHAUD ET DE LA STABILITE AU VIEILLISSEMENT DES TOLES D'ALUMINIUM ET DES PRODUITS DERIVES DE CES TOLES | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | 02
05.02.2004
25.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Aluminum Duffel BVBA A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 DUFFEL / BE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Reta, et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
02
05.02.2004
25.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Aluminum Duffel BVBA A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 DUFFEL / BE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Reta, et al, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
02
05.02.2004
25.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Corus Aluminium NV A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 Duffel / BE Opponent's representative Haselhorst, Reta, et al, et al Müller Schupfner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH Opponent's representative Marsh, Roy David Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
02
05.02.2004
Corus Aluminium NV A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 Duffel / BE Opponent's representative van der Donk, Henricus Matheus, et al, et al Corus Technology BV P.O.Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | |||
Former [2005/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | ||
02
05.02.2004
Corus Aluminium NV A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 Duffel / BE Opponent's representative van der Donk, Henricus Matheus, et al, et al Corus Technology BV P.O.Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | |||
Former [2004/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.01.2004
15.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Alcan Technology and Management Limited Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | ||
02
05.02.2004
Corus Aluminium NV A. Stocletlaan 87 2570 Duffel / BE | 17.03.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.09.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.05.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/39] | Appeal following opposition | 12.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T0956/07 | 03.08.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T0956/07 | 11.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.12.2010 | IT | 17.12.2010 | SE | 18.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | [2012/03] |
Former [2012/01] | GB | 17.12.2010 | |
SE | 18.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | SE | 18.12.2010 | |
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | SE | 18.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0616044 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 20 - line 25; example 1; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US5441582 (FUJITA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4282044 (ROBERTSON KING G, et al); | [Y]US4838958 (KOMATSUBARA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4840852 (HYLAND M ELISE [US], et al); | [Y]US3135633 (CLAUDE HORNUS JEAN); | [Y]US5362341 (PALMER SCOTT L [US], et al) |