blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0853538

EP0853538 - INJECTION MOULDING MACHINE FOR PROCESSING PLASTIFIABLE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hehl, Karl
Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32
72290 Lossburg / DE
[1998/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/30]
Representative(s)Reinhardt, Harry, et al
Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]Reinhardt, Harry, et al
Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date96944557.617.09.1996
[1998/30]
WO1996DE01779
Priority number, dateDE199513656502.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19536565
[1998/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9712739
Date:10.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0853538
Date:22.07.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853538
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.1997
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/00
[1998/30]
CPC:
B29C45/5008 (EP); B29C45/07 (EP); B29C45/231 (EP);
B29C45/66 (EP); B29C2045/235 (EP); B29C2045/5084 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1998/30]
TitleGerman:SPRITZGIESSMASCHINE ZUR VERARBEITUNG PLASTIFIZIERBARER MASSEN[1998/30]
English:INJECTION MOULDING MACHINE FOR PROCESSING PLASTIFIABLE MATERIALS[1998/30]
French:PRESSE D'INJECTION POUR TRANSFORMER DES MATIERES PLASTIFIABLES[1998/30]
Entry into regional phase11.03.1998National basic fee paid 
11.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.03.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/30]
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search   [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.