EP0877733 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMR Technology, Inc. 5429 Main Street P.O. Box 2587 Manchester Center, VT 05255-2587 / US | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states AMR Technology, Inc. 5429 Main Street P.O. Box 2587 Manchester Center, VT 05255-2587 / US | ||
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states ALBANY MOLECULAR RESEARCH, INC. 21 Corporate Circle Albany, NY 12203-0289 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AMBRA, Thomas, E. 14 Woodside Court Wynantskill, NY 12198 / US | 02 /
PILLING, Garry, M. Dunham Hollow Road, R.R. 1, Box 109A East Nassau, NY 12062 / US | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB | ||
Former [1999/23] | Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al Lewis & Taylor, 49 Stoney Street Nottingham, NG1 1LX / GB | ||
Former [1998/47] | Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al E. N. Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96945097.2 | 19.12.1996 | [1998/47] | WO1996US20769 | Priority number, date | US19950575344 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: US 575344 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722344 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877733 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877733 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/14, A61K31/445, C07D211/22, C07D211/46, C07D263/14, C07D263/10 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C07D211/54 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D211/14 (KR);
C07D211/22 (EP,US);
C07D261/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/47] | C07D211/14, A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIPERIDINDERIVATEN | [1998/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES | [1998/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE PIPERIDINE | [1998/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 30.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03077248.7 / EP1362849 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9723213 (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) [E] 1-71* claim - * | International search | [Y]US4254129 (CARR ALBERT A, et al); | [Y]US4254130 (CARR ALBERT A, et al); | [Y]US4407823 (KIRSCH GERALD [DE], et al); | [Y]US4550116 (SOTO JOSE M P [ES], et al); | [Y]WO9500480 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]); | [Y]WO9500482 (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US]) | [Y] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., 24 May 1978, Vol. 100, No. 11, MILSTEIN et al., "A General, Selective and Facile Method for Ketone Synthesis from Acid Chlorides and Organotin Compounds Catalyzed by Palladium", pages 3636-3638. | [Y] - J. ORG. CHEM., 1979, Vol. 44, No. 10, MILSTEIN et al., "Mild, Selective, General Method of Ketone Synthesis from Acid Chlorides and Organotin Compounds Catalyzed by Palladium", pages 1613-1618. | [Y] - MARCH JERRY, ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Reactions, Mechanisms and Structure, JOHN WILEY & SONS, 1992, 4th Edition, pages 478, 479, 661 and 662. | [Y] - J. ORG. CHEM., 1974, Vol. 39, No. 18, MEYERS et al., "Oxazolines. IX. Synthesis of Homologated Acetic Acids and Esters", pages 2778-2793. |