|
13.06.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
07.06.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
124 |