EP0826102 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE DRIVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISCHOF, Hubert Dornfelderweg 4 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | 02 /
STREIB, Martin Hohenzollernstrasse 13 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | [1998/10] | Application number, filing date | 96945152.5 | 02.10.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996DE01898 | Priority number, date | DE1996109242 | 09.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19609242 | [1998/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733083 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826102 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826102 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D11/10 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
F02D11/107 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (KR);
F02D41/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT EINES FAHRZEUGS | [1998/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE DRIVE UNIT | [1998/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITE MOTRICE DE VEHICULE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXA]DE4438714 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PX] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [A]EP0512240 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 35 * * column 12, line 22 - line 45 *; | [A]DE3728561 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 58 *; | [A]EP0121937 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]DE4237198 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |