blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972293

EP0972293 - ELECTRODE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MAKING FOR FERROELECTRIC CAPACITOR INTEGRATED ON SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telcordia Technologies, Inc.
445 South Street
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND
College Park, MD 20742 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / DHOTE, Anil, M.
Apartment 308 8125 48th Avenue
College Park, MD 20740 / US
02 / RAMESH, Ramamoorthy
12526 Stratford Garden Drive
Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard, et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard, et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/19]Poulin, Gérard, et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/03]Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96945201.017.12.1996
[2000/03]
WO1996US19933
Priority number, dateUS1995057849926.12.1995         Original published format: US 578499
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9723886
Date:03.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972293
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.07.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/02, H01L27/115
[2002/30]
CPC:
H10D1/696 (EP,US); H01L21/28568 (EP,US); H10D1/682 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/03]H01G4/06, H01G4/10, H01G4/20, H01G7/00, G11C11/22, G11C11/24, H01L21/70, H01L29/76
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODESTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLING VON AUF SILIZIUM INTEGRIERTEM FERROELEKTRISCHEM KONDENSATOR[2000/03]
English:ELECTRODE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MAKING FOR FERROELECTRIC CAPACITOR INTEGRATED ON SILICON[2000/03]
French:STRUCTURE D'ELECTRODE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CONDENSATEUR FERROELECTRIQUE SUR UN SUBSTRAT DE SILICIUM[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase23.06.1998National basic fee paid 
23.06.1998Search fee paid 
23.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.06.1998Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/01]
01.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200409   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4215203  (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]);
 [Y]US5440173  (EVANS JR JOSEPH T [US], et al);
International search[Y]US5248564  (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]);
 [Y]US5293510  (TAKENAKA KAZUHIRO [JP]);
 [Y]US5426075  (PERINO STANLEY [US], et al);
 [P]US5479317  (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]);
 [P]US5555486  (KINGON ANGUS I [US], et al);
 [P]US5561307  (MIHARA TAKASHI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.