EP0863826 - HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR ROAD VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR PASSENGER CARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Ernst-Dieter Lussweg 2 D-74336 Brackenheim / DE | 02 /
SCHUNCK, Eberhardt Eichbornstrasse 11 D-76829 Landau / DE | 03 /
KÄSSMANN, Andreas Pappelweg 21 D-70839 Gerlingen / DE | [1998/38] | Application number, filing date | 96945338.0 | 24.09.1996 | [1998/38] | WO1996DE01806 | Priority number, date | DE1995146647 | 14.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546647 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721573 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863826 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68, B60T8/40, B60T13/14 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
B60T8/4081 (EP,US);
B60T13/68 (KR);
B60T13/14 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/3655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/38] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE BREMSANLAGE FÜR STRASSENFAHRZEUGE, INSBESONDERE PERSONENKRAFTWAGEN | [1998/38] | English: | HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR ROAD VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR PASSENGER CARS | [1998/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE HYDRAULIQUE POUR VEHICULES ROUTIERS, NOTAMMENT POUR VOITURES PARTICULIERES | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/27] | 17.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4322182 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 45 - line 67; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4413579 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 5; figure 6 *; | [A]GB2169975 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [E]WO9709212 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE], et al) [E] 1 * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 11; figure 2 * |