blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967993

EP0967993 - ANTI-COCAINE VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2007  [2007/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
The Scripps Research Institute
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIRSCHING, Peter
P.O. Box 2228
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / JANDA, Kim, D.
3181 Erie Street
San Diego, CA 92112 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lancon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/30]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2000/01]Kiddle, Simon John, et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96945392.716.12.1996
[2000/01]
WO1996US19982
Priority number, dateUS1995057284914.12.1995         Original published format: US 572849
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9721451
Date:19.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0967993
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/395, C07K14/765, C07K14/77, C07K16/44, C12P21/08, C07D451/12
[2001/16]
CPC:
C07D451/04 (EP,US); A61K31/46 (EP,US); A61K39/0013 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US); C07D451/12 (EP,US); C07F9/6561 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (EP,US); A61K2039/6081 (EP,US); Y10S530/807 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/01]A61K39/395, C07K14/765, C07K14/77, C07K16/44, C12P21/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ANTI-KOKAINE VAKZINE[2000/01]
English:ANTI-COCAINE VACCINE[2000/01]
French:VACCIN ANTI-COCAINE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1998National basic fee paid 
03.07.1998Search fee paid 
03.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.07.1998Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/01]
04.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/01]
Request for further processing for:26.05.2004Request for further processing filed
27.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200510   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3966744  (GOLDSTEIN AVRAM, et al);
 [Y]US5233042  (BUECHLER KENNETH F [US]);
 [Y]US5463028  (LANDRY DONALD W [US], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.