blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0883522

EP0883522 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETECTING A VEHICLE ROLL-OVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MATTES, Bernhard
Querstrasse 41
D-74343 Sachsenheim / DE
02 / SEYFANG, Walter
Egolsheimer Strasse 3
D-71691 Freiberg / DE
03 / HENNE, Michael
Schillerstrasse 33
D-74374 Zaberfeld / DE
[1998/51]
Application number, filing date96945517.910.10.1996
[1998/51]
WO1996DE01997
Priority number, dateDE199610917611.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609176
[1998/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9733774
Date:18.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0883522
Date:16.12.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0883522
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/13
[1998/51]
CPC:
B60R21/0132 (EP,US); B60R21/13 (KR); B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0018 (EP,US); B60R2021/01322 (US); B60R2021/01325 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01327 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ERKENNEN EINES FAHRZEUG-ÜBERSCHLAGS[1998/51]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETECTING A VEHICLE ROLL-OVER[1998/51]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER LE CAPOTAGE D'UN VEHICULE[1998/51]
Entry into regional phase12.10.1998National basic fee paid 
12.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/51]
26.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0430813  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 6 * figure 4; claim 4 * [Y] 1-3,7;
 [Y]EP0364965  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * page 3, lines 15-24 *;
 [XA]EP0662601  (OKADA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 6 * page 2, lines 9-12 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 20 * [A] 1,7;
 [Y]DE3825088  (BOSCH) [Y] 2 * column 6, lines 12-15; claim 1 *;
 [PYA]EP0709255  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 3 * claims 1-4 * [A] 4,5;
 [YA]EP0528514  (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [Y] 3 * claim 13 * [A] 4,5;
 [Y]JPH06160525
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940906), vol. 018, no. 478, Database accession no. (P - 1796), & JP06160525 A 19940607 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.