EP1007959 - GAS INLET SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN Northern Ireland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states QUEENS'S UNIVERSITY OF BELFAST University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF DUNDEE Dundee DD1 4HN, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER-AUGENSTEIN, Wolfram Beech Hill House Beech Hill Road Coupar Angus Blairgowrie PH13 9AZ / GB | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2009/48] |
Former [2006/18] | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96945559.1 | 23.12.1996 | [2000/24] | WO1996GB03213 | Priority number, date | GB19950026508 | 23.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9526508 | GB19960015803 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9615803 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723779 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007959 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007959 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/84, H01J49/04 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H01J49/0422 (EP);
G01N30/84 (EP);
H01J49/0009 (EP);
G01N2030/8405 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G01N2030/625, G01N2030/383 (EP);
G01N2030/625, G01N30/10 (EP);
G01N2030/625, G01N30/7213 (EP);
G01N30/7213, G01N30/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | AL | 17.07.1998 | LT | 17.07.1998 | LV | 17.07.1998 | RO | 17.07.1998 | SI | 17.07.1998 | Title | German: | GASEINLASSSYSTEM | [2000/24] | English: | GAS INLET SYSTEM | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTREE DE GAZ | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP05026613.9 / EP1637878 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Request for further processing for: | 15.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0419167 (VG INSTR GROUP [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 8, lines 16-26 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5012052 (HAYES JOHN M [US]) [X] 1,4,6 * column 6, lines 65-68 * * column 13, lines 10-22 * * column 16, line 57 - column 17, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US5281397 (LIGON WOODFIN V [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 35; figure 3 *; | [A]US5424539 (BRAND WILLI [DE], et al) [A] 2 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 42 ** column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 47; figure 2 *; | [A]US5432344 (BRAND WILLI [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 25-57 *; | [AP]WO9608719 (FISONS PLC [GB], et al) [AP] 1 * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2; figure 1 * |