EP0862711 - PIPE BEND FOR FEED PIPES FOR FEEDING LIQUIDS OR GASES WHICH MAY POSSIBLY BE LADEN WITH SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dedegil, Mehmet Yavuz, Dr.-Ing. Berckmüllerstrasse 5 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Weber, Manfred, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Karlsruher Weg 10 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states Dedegil, Mehmet Yavuz Berckmüllerstrasse 5 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
For all designated states Weber, Manfred Karlruher Weg 10 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Pietruk, Claus Peter Patentanwalt Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Pietruk, Claus Peter Woogstrasse 4 67659 Kaiserslautern / DE | ||
Former [1998/37] | Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Im Speitel 102 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 96945723.3 | 14.11.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996DE02166 | Priority number, date | DE1995143256 | 20.11.1995 Original published format: DE 19543256 | DE1996112887 | 30.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612887 | [1998/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9719286 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862711 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L57/00, F16L41/02, F16L43/00, B65G53/52 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B65G53/523 (EP);
F16L41/02 (EP);
F16L43/00 (EP);
F16L57/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | ROHRKRÜMMER FÜR FÖRDERLEITUNGEN ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON GEGEBENENFALLS FESTSTOFFBEFRACHTETEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN ODER GASEN | [1998/37] | English: | PIPE BEND FOR FEED PIPES FOR FEEDING LIQUIDS OR GASES WHICH MAY POSSIBLY BE LADEN WITH SOLIDS | [1998/37] | French: | COUDE POUR CONDUITES SERVANT AU TRANSPORT DE LIQUIDES OU DE GAZ EVENTUELLEMENT CHARGES DE SOLIDES | [2000/27] |
Former [1998/37] | RACCORD COUDE POUR CONDUITES DE LIQUIDES OU DE GAZ EVENTUELLEMENT CHARGES DE SOLIDES | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/22] | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1012822 (SAARLAENDISCHE STEININDUSTRIE O. BIEGEL GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1550003 (FA. H. KRANTZ) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR1119149 (O. BIEGEL GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1135039 (F. ORCAIRE ET AL.) [A] 1 * the whole document * |