EP0868583 - AUTOMATIC CAR PARK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westfalia WST Systemtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 11 33829 Borgholzhausen / DE | [2002/01] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Krups Kompaktlogistik GmbH Wilhelmstrasse 26 42697 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADAELLI, Luigi Kirchweg 3 CH-5723 Teufenthal / CH | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Philipp, Matthias, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Philipp, Matthias, Dr., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Hollerallee 32 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Boehmert & Boehmert, Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/41] | Neisen, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Reinhardswaldstrasse 8 33332 Gütersloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 96945911.4 | 20.12.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996EP05764 | Priority number, date | DE1995148748 | 23.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19548748 | [1998/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723697 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868583 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868583 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/22 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
E04H6/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES PARKHAUS | [1998/41] | English: | AUTOMATIC CAR PARK | [1998/41] | French: | GARAGE ELEVATEUR | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 04.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.1999 | 31.12.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.07.2002 | DK | 10.10.2002 | SE | 10.10.2002 | [2005/21] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 10.10.2002 | |
SE | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 10.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0351374 (COMAU SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 42; figure - *; | [DA]EP0376621 (SHAHAR MOSHE [IL], et al) [DA] 9-14,16 * column 12, line 23 - column 15, line 2; figures 21-28 *; | [A]WO9110794 (GILBERT DAVID LESTER [AU]); | [A]EP0478070 (COENCO SA [CH], et al) [A] 9,10,13,14 * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0505808 (NECKAR STAHLBAUTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4227609 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE4305993 (REUSS RITA [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-7; claims 1,9 * |