EP0870041 - KVLQT1 - A LONG QT SYNDROME GENE WHICH ENCODES KVLQT1 WHICH COASSEMBLES WITH minK TO FORM CARDIAC Iks POTASSIUM CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/42] | KVLQT1 - A LONG QT SYNDROME GENE WHICH ENCODES KVLQT1 WHICH COASSEMBLES WITH minK TO FORM CARDIAC I Ks? POTASSIUM CHANNELS | ||
[1999/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states The University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF UTAH RESEARCH FOUNDATION 421 Wakara Way, Suite 170 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEATING, Mark, T. 78 Laurel Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | 02 /
SANGUINETTI, Michael, C. 4922 East Meadows Drive Park City, UT 84060 / US | 03 /
CURRAN, Mark, E. 227 Wood Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
KEATING, Mark, T. 78 Laurel Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | ||
02 /
SANGUINETTI, Michael, C. 4922 East Meadows Drive Park City, UT 84060 / US | |||
03 /
CURRAN, Mark, E. 227 Wood Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | |||
04 /
WANG, Qing 3316 Daleford Road Shaker Heights, Ohio 44120 / US | |||
Former [1999/25] | 01 /
KEATING, Mark, T. 78 Laurel Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | ||
02 /
SANGUINETTI, Michael, C. 4922 East Meadows Drive Park City, UT 84060 / US | |||
03 /
CURRAN, Mark, E. 227 Wood Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | |||
Former [1998/42] | 01 /
KEATING, Mark, T. 78 Laurel Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | ||
02 /
SANGUINETTI, Michael, C. 4922 East Meadows Drive Park City, UT 84060 / US | |||
03 /
CURRAN, Mark, E. 1032 E. 400 South 610B Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Irvine, Jonquil Claire, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/42] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96945935.3 | 20.12.1996 | [1998/42] | WO1996US19756 | Priority number, date | US19950019014P | 22.12.1995 Original published format: US 19014 P | US19960739383 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: US 739383 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9723598 | Date: | 03.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0870041 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870041 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, A01N43/04, A61K31/70 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | C12N15/63, C12N5/00, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | KVLQT1 - EIN GEN DES LONG-QT-SYNDROMS, WELCHES FÜR KVLQT1 KODIERT UND WELCHES SICH MIT Mink ZUSAMMENSETZT, UM Iks-KALIUMKANÄLE DES HERZENS ZU BILDEN | [1999/52] | English: | KVLQT1 - A LONG QT SYNDROME GENE WHICH ENCODES KVLQT1 WHICH COASSEMBLES WITH minK TO FORM CARDIAC Iks POTASSIUM CHANNELS | [1999/52] | French: | KVLQT1- GENE DU SYNDROME DU QT LONG CODANT POUR KVLQT1, QUI SE COASSEMBLE AVEC minK POUR FORMER DES CANAUX POTASSIQUES CARDIAQUES Iks | [1999/52] |
Former [1998/42] | KVLQT1 - EIN GEN DES LONG-QT-SYNDROMS, WELCHES FÜR KVLQT1 KODIERT UND WELCHES SICH MIT MINK ZUSAMMENSETZT, UM I-Ks?-KALIUMKANÄLE DES HERZENS ZU BILDEN | ||
Former [1998/42] | KVLQT1 - A LONG QT SYNDROME GENE WHICH ENCODES KVLQT1 WHICH COASSEMBLES WITH minK TO FORM CARDIAC I Ks? POTASSIUM CHANNELS | ||
Former [1998/42] | KVLQT1- GENE DU SYNDROME DU QT LONG CODANT POUR KVLQT1, QUI SE COASSEMBLE AVEC minK POUR FORMER DES CANAUX POTASSIQUES CARDIAQUES I Ks? | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | IT | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - BARHANIN J ET AL, "KVLQT1 AND ISK (MINK) PROTEINS ASSOCIATE TO FORM TH IKS CARDIAC POTASSIUM CURRENT", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19961107), vol. 384, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 78 - 80, XP002910425 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384078a0 | International search | [YE]US5599673 (KEATING MARK T [US], et al); | [XP] - SANGUINETTI M C, ET AL., "COASSEMBLY OF KVLQT1 AND MINK (ISK) PROTEINS TO FORM CARDIAC I POTASSIUM CHANNEL", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19961107), vol. 384, doi:10.1038/384080a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 80 - 83, XP002916128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384080a0 | [X] - RUKNUDIN A M, ET AL., "CHARACTERIZATION OF A HUMAN MINK CHANNEL EXPRESSE IN XENOPUS OOCYTES", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., (19930101), XP001022126 | [X] - WANG Q, ET AL., "POSITIONAL CLONING OF A NOVEL POTASSIUM CHANNEL GENE:KVLQT1 MUTATIONS CAUSE CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS", NATURE GENETICS., Nature Publishing Group, NEW YORK, US, NEW YORK, US, (19960112), vol. 12, no. 01, doi:10.1038/ng0196-17, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 17 - 23, XP002916129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0196-17 | [YP] - ATTALI B, "A NEW WAVE FOR HEART RHYTHMS", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19961107), vol. 384, doi:10.1038/384024a0, ISSN 0028-0836, page 24/25, XP002916130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384024a0 | [Y] - Lai, L.-P. Deng, C.-L. Moss, A.J. Kass, R.S. Liang, C.-s., "Polymorphism of the gene encoding a human minimal potassium ion channel (minK)", GENE., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19941230), vol. 151, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)90685-8, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 339 - 340, XP004042666 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90685-8 | [YP] - TANG M D, KACZMAREL L K, "Identification of a Novel KvLQT1-Like Gene (KL1)", ABSTRACTS OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., US, US, (19961101), vol. 22, no. 496.2, ISSN 0190-5295, page 1245, XP002965603 | [YP] - RODEN D M, ET AL., "MULTIPLE MECHANISMS IN THE LONG-QT SYNDROME CURRENT KNOWLEDGE, GAPS, AND FUTURE DIRECTIONS", Circulation, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, US, US, (19961015), vol. 94, no. 08, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1996 - 2012, XP009007234 | [YP] - PRIORI S. G., CANTU F., SCHWARTZ P. J., "THE LONG QT SYNDROME: NEW DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC APPROACH IN THE ERA OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY.", Schweizerische Medizinische Wochenschrift, E M H Schweizerischer Aerzteverlag AG, CH, CH, (19960101), vol. 126., no. 41., ISSN 0036-7672, pages 1727 - 1731., XP000865562 | [YP] - CIRCULATION, 10 November 1996, Vol. 94, No. 8, CHOY et al., "Regional Expression of HERG and KVLQT1 in Heart Failure", Abstract 0952, page I164., XP002965638 | [AP] - PRIORI S-G, NAPOLITANO C, SCHWARTZ P-J, "A Molecular Basis For the Therapy of the Long QT Syndro me", ARCHIVES DES MALADIES DU COEUR ET DES VAISSEAUX., J.B. BALLIERE, PARIS., FR, FR, (19960901), vol. 89, no. 9, ISSN 0003-9683, pages 1185 - 1187, XP002965650 | [AP] - LI HUA, ET AL., "Chromosome 11-Linke d Long QT Syndrome (LQT1) is the Most Common Form of Long QT Syndrome", PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, EVANSTON, IL,, US, US, (19961025), vol. 98, no. 3, ISSN 0031-4005, pages 534 - 535, XP002965651 |