EP0783832 - Flower pot with base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haymann, Margrit Alexanderring 19 57627 Hachenburg / DE | [1997/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Kossobutzki, Walter Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Waldstrasse 6 56244 Helferskirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Kossobutzki, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Hochstrasse 7 56244 Helferskirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97100100.3 | 07.01.1997 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | DE1996100508 | 09.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19600508 | DE1996128027 | 11.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628027 | [1997/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0783832 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0783832 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
A01G9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1997/29] | Title | German: | Pflanztopf mit Untersatz | [1997/29] | English: | Flower pot with base | [1997/29] | French: | Pot de fleur avec support | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 07.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/02] | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB226099 (DENTRAYGUES) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XA]US1778150 (FREEBURG) [X] 1,7-11 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [XP]DE29600283U (HAYMANN) [XP] 1-3,7-11 * claim - *; | [A]CH276343 (MIERITZ) [A] 1-3,7-11 * page 2, line 29 - line 37; figure 4; claim - *; | [A]FR2664467 (CLAROUS FRERES ET CO.) [A] 1-3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1221710 (CARRE) [A] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * |