EP0785224 - Process for preparing hydrophilic hydrogels with high swelling capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelhardt, Fritz, Dr. 131 Harbour Watch Drive Chesapeake, Virginia 23320 / US | 02 /
Daniel, Thomas, Dr. 4161 Prindle Ct. No. 204 Chesapeake, VA 23321 / US | 03 /
Herfert, Norbert, Dr. Auf dem Hansenberg 10 63674 Altenstadt / DE | 04 /
Remmel, Gustav Leipzigerstrasse 24 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
Riegel, Ulrich Steinäckerstrasse 6 60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 06 /
Stüven, Uwe, Dr.-Ing. Im Hopfengarten 35 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [1997/30] | Application number, filing date | 97100322.3 | 10.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | DE1996101764 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19601764 | [1997/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785224 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785224 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785224 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/075, C08L101/14, C08J11/06 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
C08J3/075 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | C08J3/075 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung hydrophiler, hochquellfähiger Hydrogele | [1997/30] | English: | Process for preparing hydrophilic hydrogels with high swelling capacity | [1997/30] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'hydrogels hydrophyliques à haute capacité de gonflage | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | GR | 09.07.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0463388 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0063331 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 3 - line 7 *; | [A]US4950692 (LEWIS WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 5, line 56 - line 59 * | by applicant | DE3741157 | WO9201008 | EP0513780 | EP0463388 | US4057521 | US4062817 | US4525527 | US4286082 | US4340706 | US4295987 | US5011892 | US4076663 | US4931497 | US4041496 | EP0343427 | DE1301566 | - W.C. GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSMETIC CHEM., (1954), vol. 5, page 249 | - MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1947), vol. 1, page 169 |