EP0786322 - Apparatus for producing a hose- or tube like moulded object from a fibre reinforced reactive resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastobras Holding S.A. 304, route de Thionville 5801 Hesperange / LU | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weigel, Jürgen Barfüsser Strasse 24a 99817 Eisenach / DE | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Kossobutzki, Walter Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Waldstrasse 6 56244 Helferskirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Kossobutzki, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Hochstrasse 7 56244 Helferskirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97100897.4 | 22.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | DE1996102726 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19602726 | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786322 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786322 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/68, B29C53/80 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B29C53/8066 (EP);
B29C53/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines schlauch- oder rohrartigen Formkörpers aus einem faserverstärkten Reaktionsharz | [1997/31] | English: | Apparatus for producing a hose- or tube like moulded object from a fibre reinforced reactive resin | [1997/31] | French: | Dispositif pour la production d'un corps moulé tubulaire en résine réactive renforcé par des fibres | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.11.2000 | FI | 15.11.2000 | FR | 15.11.2000 | GB | 15.11.2000 | IT | 15.11.2000 | NL | 15.11.2000 | AT | 22.01.2001 | CH | 31.01.2001 | LI | 31.01.2001 | DK | 15.02.2001 | PT | 15.02.2001 | SE | 15.02.2001 | GR | 16.02.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/51] | ES | 15.11.2000 | |
FI | 15.11.2000 | ||
FR | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
NL | 15.11.2000 | ||
AT | 22.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 15.02.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
GR | 16.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/35] | ES | 15.11.2000 | |
FI | 15.11.2000 | ||
FR | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
NL | 15.11.2000 | ||
AT | 22.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 15.02.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 15.11.2000 | |
FI | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
NL | 15.11.2000 | ||
AT | 22.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 15.02.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 15.11.2000 | |
FI | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
NL | 15.11.2000 | ||
AT | 22.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 15.11.2000 | |
FI | 15.11.2000 | ||
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 15.11.2000 | |
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | FI | 15.11.2000 | |
GB | 15.11.2000 | ||
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | FI | 15.11.2000 | |
PT | 15.02.2001 | ||
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FI | 15.11.2000 | |
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
FR | 13.04.2001 | ||
Former [2001/51] | FI | 15.11.2000 | |
SE | 15.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 15.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0012826 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4494436 (KRUESI AUGUST H [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0211535 (HERCULES INC [US])[A] 1-7 | by applicant | DE19944430506 |