EP0785231 - Propylene resin extruded articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation 1-10-1 Yurakucho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation 1-10-1 Yurakucho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation 1-10-1 Yurakucho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimura, Kazumasa, c/o Japan Polychem Corporation Yokkaichi Technical Center, 1 Toho-cho Yokkaichi-chi, Mie 510 / JP | 02 /
Inagaki, Hitoshi, c/o Japan Polychem Corporation Yokkaichi Technical Center, 1 Toho-cho Yokkaichi-chi, Mie 510 / JP | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97100950.1 | 22.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | JP19960008275 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: JP 827596 | JP19960010058 | 24.01.1996 Original published format: JP 1005896 | JP19960085022 | 08.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8502296 | JP19960086440 | 09.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8644096 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0785231 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785231 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, // (C08L23/10, C08K5:52, 5:3435, 5:098) | [1997/30] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (EP,US);
Y10S524/913 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0008, C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1997/30] | Title | German: | Extrudierte Gegenstände aus Polypropylenmassen | [1997/30] | English: | Propylene resin extruded articles | [1997/30] | French: | Produits d'extrusion en résine de polypropylène | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5219600 (KOSEGAKI KIMIHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]GB2278362 (SANDOZ LTD [CH])[A] 1-7 |