EP0792967 - Fibre pulp, its preparation and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoechst Trevira GmbH & Co. KG Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuert, Richard, Dr. Brunner Weg 2 90610 Winkelhaid / DE | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/36] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/27] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 97101008.7 | 23.01.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | DE1996106959 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19606959 | [1997/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792967 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0792967 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21H13/18, D21H13/26, F16D69/02, C08K7/02, C04B16/06, D01F6/80 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
D21H13/26 (EP);
C04B16/06 (EP);
C04B40/0028 (EP);
D01F6/80 (EP);
D21H13/18 (EP);
F16D69/026 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B40/0028, C04B16/0658, C04B16/0691, C04B28/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, NL [1997/36] | Title | German: | Faserpulp, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dessen Verwendung | [1997/36] | English: | Fibre pulp, its preparation and its use | [1997/36] | French: | Pulpe de fibres, sa préparation et son utilisation | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 04.02.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0352363 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0264096 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0444473 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [A] 1-11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4811908 (GALATI CELESTE C [US]) [A] 12-14 * column W *; | [A]US5472995 (KAMINSKI STANLEY S [US], et al); | [A]JPS4994906 ; | [A]EP0688743 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 15, Database accession no. 75-24905W, XP002055181 & JPS4994906 A 19740909 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - HEINRICH K ET AL, "NEW CONCEPTS IN PARA-ARAMID FIBERS", TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL, (19921201), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 771 - 775, XP000323192 | by applicant | EP0444473 | DE3002484 | DE2556883 | DE3007063 | EP0199090 | EP0364891 | EP0364892 | EP0364893 | EP0424860 |